ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 232249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Namely to use all lawful means to prevent cruelty, promote kindness and alleviate suffering of animals; To carry out other Practical Animal Welfare services such as rehoming animals and providing Veterinary treatment in the Wigan, Leigh and District area. To conduct humane education. To operate a Charity Shop, the profits from which fund the above services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £334,393
Total expenditure: £216,239

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA WIGAN, LEIGH AND BRANCH (Working name)
  • R S P C A WIGAN AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
  • R S P C A WIGAN LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geraldine Ann MILES Chair 15 February 2012
None on record
John Hodge Trustee 22 January 2025
HILLDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Dorothy Haunch Trustee 29 June 2022
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Rachel Lorraine Blundell Trustee 09 April 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Steven Gilmore Trustee 09 April 2020
None on record
Julie Clark Trustee 18 September 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Lesley Denise Watmough Trustee 06 December 2016
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Geoffrey Abbott Trustee 05 January 2014
None on record
Patricia Edna Abbott Trustee 05 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £163.91k £116.51k £224.97k £178.84k £334.39k
Total expenditure £160.94k £135.21k £146.02k £176.40k £216.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.91k £29.96k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
R S P C A
York House
York Street
WIGAN
WN3 4BY
Phone:
01942824165