Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 232249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geraldine Ann MILES Chair 15 February 2012
None on record
John Hodge Trustee 22 January 2025
HILLDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Dorothy Haunch Trustee 29 June 2022
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Rachel Lorraine Blundell Trustee 09 April 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Steven Gilmore Trustee 09 April 2020
None on record
Julie Clark Trustee 18 September 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Lesley Denise Watmough Trustee 06 December 2016
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WIGAN, LEIGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Geoffrey Abbott Trustee 05 January 2014
None on record
Patricia Edna Abbott Trustee 05 January 2014
None on record