ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LANCASHIRE EAST BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Branch are to promote kindness and prevent cruelty to animals. Our key aim is to find suitable homes for as many animals as possible, and provide proper care for those who have been mistreated or abandoned (we are not licensed to accept stray dogs!). The main activity for achieving our aim is the operation of an Animal Centre at Altham near Accrington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 January 1969: Standard registration
- RSPCA LANCASHIRE EAST BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA - LANCASHIRE - EAST BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amber Ruth Bentley | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Myra Fairclough | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Joy Jonsson | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gulshan Ayub | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Kilner | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Taylor | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Freestone | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Shanks | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ying Tan | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lianne O'Boyle | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natallia Robertson | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James French | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Martin West | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350.66k | £586.27k | £348.88k | £561.58k | £329.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £465.85k | £428.20k | £439.21k | £399.70k | £518.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.84k | £20.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £469.02k | N/A | £369.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £56.95k | N/A | £134.75k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £59.99k | N/A | £57.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £309 | N/A | £356 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £220.10k | N/A | £273.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £372.77k | N/A | £361.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £55.43k | N/A | £38.33k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | £20.21k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009 as amended on 27 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
EAST LANCASHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nearer Holker House Farm
Enfield Road
Accrington
BB5 6NN
- Phone:
- 01254231118
- Email:
- info@rspca-lancseast.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window