ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PRESTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote kindness and prevent cruelty to animals. Branch animal welfare work helping people in need with the care of their animals. Rehabilitation and rehoming of animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
76 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 December 1963: Standard registration
- RSPCA PRESTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA - PRESTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BAXTER | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|||||
paul Draycott | Trustee | 25 April 2018 | ||||||
Michael Stuart Tomlinson | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.25k | £418.27k | £497.97k | £713.33k | £456.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396.93k | £404.14k | £449.96k | £512.97k | £533.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.32k | £41.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £437.27k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £275.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £527 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £112 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £293.32k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £345.29k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £167.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.96k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
PRESTON AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRESTON & DISTRICT BRANCH
ANIMAL CENTRE
SLACK COTTAGE
LONGRIDGE ROAD
PRESTON
PR2 6QL
- Phone:
- 01772 792533
- Email:
- Info@rspca-preston.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window