RSPCA SUNDERLAND, HARTLEPOOL & SOUTH TYNESIDE BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal welfare support in Sunderland, Hartlepool and South Tyneside (including some areas in County Durham and Gateshead). We provide welfare assistance (signposting and advice), assisted neutering scheme, pet food bank, education and funded vet clinics (criteria apply to all services). This branch does not currently have animal shelter facilities or accept animals from the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 13 December 1963: Standard registration
- RSPCA DURHAM, HARTLEPOOL AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRSPCA HARTLEPOOL & DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS DURHAM, HARTLEPOOL AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - DURHAM - HARTLEPOOL AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA HARTLEPOOL & DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - HARTLEPOOL AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - HARTLEPOOLS AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Collins | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
John Eland | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Scott | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joannah Dobbie | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Gilpin | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £448.41k | £247.94k | £82.75k | £47.76k | £66.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.77k | £376.55k | £211.95k | £130.43k | £147.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.31k | £17.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 1 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
HARTLEPOOL AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RSPCA
19 Front Street
CHESTER LE STREET
County Durham
DH3 3BQ
- Phone:
- 01912507148
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window