THE HERBERT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of facilities for voice training, instruction and training in diction and elocution for any person who shall be authorised to read or speak in any Anglican Church in the Diocese of Bath and Wells
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE VERY REVD DR JOHN DAVIES | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rt Rev Ruth Elizabeth Worsley | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|||||
REVD JOHN MARTIN THOROGOOD | Trustee | 11 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01k | £1.98k | £1.86k | £1.96k | £2.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.56k | £1.25k | £1.24k | £1.31k | £1.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 04/11/1963 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR VOICE TRAINING AND INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN DICTION AND ELOCUTION FOR STUDENTS OF WELLS THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE AND FOR CLERGY OF THE DIOCESES OF BATH AND WELLS.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF BATH AND WELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bath & Wells DBF
Flourish House
2 Cathedral Avenue
WELLS
Somerset
BA5 1FD
- Phone:
- 01749670777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window