CHERRYTREE

Charity Number: 232351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting homeless young people aged between 16 and 21 to secure their own accommodation by providing them with temporary accommodation and support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £55,592
Total expenditure: £132,598

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 1966: Standard registration
  • 01 August 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHERRYTREE ORPHANAGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Walker Chair 09 June 2014
None on record
Trevor Higginbottom Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Kathryn Grayson Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Alan Stuart Brown Trustee 01 March 2023
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Received: On time
Lynne Urpeth Trustee 08 July 2019
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Received: On time
JOHN KENNETH FULLER Trustee 03 July 2017
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Received: On time
DISABILITY SHEFFIELD CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING LIMITED
Received: On time
LIZ MURRAY Trustee
THE SIR HENRY STEPHENSON ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
DERWENT COTTAGE HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD FAMILY HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Received: On time
MR JON DUNN Trustee
TAPTONHOLME
Received: On time
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Received: On time
THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION 2014
Received: On time
JANICE KATHRYN HOOLE Trustee
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £63.72k £53.13k £60.62k £58.89k £55.59k
Total expenditure £170.24k £129.06k £105.75k £84.11k £132.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT DERBY DISTRICT PROBATE REGISTRY ON 29 JUNE 1889 AS AMENDED ON 15 JANUARY 1996 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT AND SUPPORT OF THE CHERRYTREE ORPHANAGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 30 December 1966 : Standard registration
  • 01 August 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
CHERRY TREE SUPPORT SERVICES LTD
CHERRY TREE
MICKLEY LANE
SHEFFIELD
S17 4HE
Phone:
01142369260