THE CHARITY OF THE SISTERS OF THE RESURRECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of nursery education and of social and pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ealing
- Italy
- Poland
Governance
- 20 April 1964: Standard registration
- SISTERS OF THE RESURRECTION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER Kathleen Delaney | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SISTER Elizabeth Geraghty | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SISTER ALEKSANDRA KOWALSKA | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SISTER ELIZABETH FEEHENY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SISTER EILEEN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £634.13k | £33.19k | £15.85k | £38.97k | £27.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.08k | £208.76k | £1.24m | £537.25k | £74.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £632.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £616.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £84.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £35 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £35 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 APRIL 1955 AS REVOKED BY TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JULY 2000.
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION OR FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Carlton Road
London
W5 2AW
- Phone:
- 02089988954
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window