THE SISTERS OF NOTRE DAME (OF NAMUR)

Charity number: 232411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Sisters of Notre Dame are a group of religious women whose main aim is to contribute to the advancement of Roman Catholic religion by involvement in education, broadly conceived. This they do by formation of the young, various voluntary ministries, and support for educational and catechetical programmes and institutions. They are committed to the care of their aged, sick and infirm sisters.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Congo
  • Kenya
  • Nigeria
  • Peru
  • Scotland
  • South Africa
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • SISTERS OF NOTRE DAME (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sister Gail Taylor Trustee 15 August 2024
None on record
Sister Elizabeth Brady Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
Sister Catherine Mary Darby SND Trustee 15 August 2021
None on record
Sister Margaret Walsh SND Trustee 15 August 2021
None on record
The Notre Dame Trustee Co Limited Trustee 31 December 1953
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.34m £3.26m £4.00m £3.28m £4.55m
Total expenditure £4.31m £4.83m £4.18m £4.15m £4.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.17k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.10m £3.02m £3.40m £2.77m £3.76m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.14k £17.99k £18.34k £18.05k £6.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £230.75k £215.97k £219.70k £253.41k £239.07k
Income - Other £1.88k £5.50k £359.40k £232.72k £542.07k
Income - Legacies £118.58k £177.78k £717.89k £169.48k £51.42k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.28m £4.79m £4.14m £4.11m £4.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.03k £39.33k £41.51k £42.41k £39.29k
Expenditure - Governance £17.36k £18.68k £20.19k £20.00k £22.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £13.14k £15.04k £6.39k £7.00k £7.74k
Expenditure - Investment management £27.75k £27.96k £29.85k £31.11k £26.89k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £20.32m £19.40m £18.66m £17.41m £17.09m
Long-term investments £7.33m £7.25m £7.96m £7.74m £6.41m
Other assets £606.47k £991.25k £1.64m £1.97m £2.61m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.15m £1.82m £1.89m £1.82m £807.43k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sisters Of Notre Dame
The Provincialate
266 Woolton Road
Childwall
Liverpool
L16 8NF
Phone:
01516650600