Financial history LIVERPOOL CORN TRADE GUILD

Charity number: 232414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.85k £7.75k £8.02k £8.33k £8.46k
Total expenditure £10.05k £9.49k £9.79k £33.12k £7.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A