THE ABBEYFIELD FAREHAM SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 232531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide sheltered housing for elderly persons

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £302,165
Total expenditure: £262,058

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Trevor Desmond Fredrick Ayles Chair 13 July 2022
None on record
Lorraine Vivienne Miller Trustee 30 June 2024
None on record
Gary Alan Taylor Trustee 30 May 2024
None on record
Jane Gould Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Nicholas How Trustee 13 July 2022
KEY TO JOY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £189.04k £220.37k £226.77k £247.18k £302.17k
Total expenditure £180.88k £177.86k £196.84k £241.25k £262.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 11 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 18 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24-26 EAST STREET
FAREHAM
HAMPSHIRE
PO16 0BY
Phone:
01329233532
Website:

WWW.ABBEYFIELD.COM/MEMBER-SOCIETIES/WESTERN/A/ABBEYFIELD-FAREHAM-SOCIETY