Financial history TRUSTEES OF THE FRANCISCAN SISTERS -MINORESS

Charity number: 232532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £610.00k £437.70k £1.16m £456.53k £939.86k
Total expenditure £436.98k £441.16k £658.64k £523.56k £881.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £390.78k N/A £283.37k N/A £466.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £205.46k N/A £152.84k N/A £215.05k
Income - Other £13.76k N/A £728.15k N/A £258.51k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £2.69k N/A £183.38k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £384.86k N/A £601.12k N/A £811.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.12k N/A £57.52k N/A £69.79k
Expenditure - Governance £13.50k N/A £15.48k N/A £22.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £34.58k N/A £278.31k N/A £438.95k
Expenditure - Investment management £52.12k N/A £57.52k N/A £69.79k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0