HOSPITALLER ORDER OF SAINT JOHN OF GOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide: the Hospitaller core values to the work of St John of God; the premises from which the charity the Saint John of God Hospitaller Services (SJOGHS) operates & conducts its charitable activities; direct care, pastoral and ministerial support to SJOGHS; financial support to new,'unmet need services', identified in other SJOG related entities particularly SJOGHS in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 November 1966: Standard registration
- ST JOHN OF GOD MANAGEMENT SERVICES (Working name)
- TRUST PROPERTY ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE HOSPITALLER ORDER OF SAINT JOHN OF GOD (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brother Malachy Brannigan | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
BROTHER DONATUS FORKAN | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Br Robert Moore | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £2.00k | £0 | £3.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JULY 1966, RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 1 OCTOBER 2003, AND THE SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 10 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1-3 Yarn
Lingfield House
Lingfield Point
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL1 1RW
- Phone:
- 01325373700
- Email:
- enquiries@sjog.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window