BRYAN BECK ESTATE

Charity Number: 232552
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Donations towards the Church funds " for childrens activities ie. Sports day & Christmas party " to the over 80's towards winter fuel

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £1,909
Total expenditure: £1,431

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CARTMEL FELL CHARITIES (Working name)
  • BRIAN BECK ESTATE (Previous name)
  • BRIAN BECK ESTATE AND OTHERS KNOWN AS THE CARTMELL FELL CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL JAMES SMITH Trustee
CARTMEL FELL COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN HOWARD SEED Trustee
None on record
Evelyn Cervetti Trustee
None on record
Anne Foster Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £109 £2.21k £1.16k £1.91k £1.91k
Total expenditure £1.25k £1.23k £1.33k £1.72k £1.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 March 2022 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 March 2021 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
AC REPORT VOL 1 P 44 AND 85 AND SCHEME OF 5 APRIL 1979
Charitable objects
INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF CARTMELFELL
Registration history
  • 20 April 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Cartmel Fell
Cartmel Fell
Grange-over-sands
Cumbria
LA11 6NP
Phone:
07786753362
Website:

No information available