CHARITY OF SIR EDWIN DURNING-LAWRENCE INCLUDING THE ROWSE BEQUEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give financial assistance to the poor and needy in the parish of St. Agnes. Cornwall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 09 April 1964: Standard registration
- THE DURNING LAWRENCE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH MARTIN LLB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
William Paul Colum Barry | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Lewis Heard | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Margaret Rodda | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Anouska Andreou | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Lindsay Turner | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CADDY | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WHITWORTH DR | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
GLYNIS ANN TEAGLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
HELEN LORRAINE BENNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH ANTHONY HUSBAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.27k | £14.29k | £14.37k | £14.61k | £12.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.55k | £4.50k | £15.02k | £19.50k | £13.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JANUARY 1949
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT EITHER OF THE POOR OF ST AGNES GENERALLY OR OF SUCH PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT.
Area of benefit
ST AGNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fern Hollow
Goonbell
ST. AGNES
TR5 0PH
- Phone:
- 01872552685
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window