THE HILDEN CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hilden Charitable Fund is a grant making trust. Hilden's current grant making priorities are: asylum seekers and refugees; penal affairs; and overseas. Grants awarded are usually in the region of £5,000 to £7,000.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR M B H RAMPTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Daniel Walter Rodeck | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
BANDI MBUBI | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jenkins | Trustee | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Amos Rampton | Trustee | 17 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Samia Khatun | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR CH RODECK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH RODECK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS MAGGIE BAXTER CBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR D S RAMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AJM RAMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £437.50k | £405.48k | £405.48k | £354.19k | £384.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £643.84k | £691.32k | £691.32k | £743.31k | £1.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 8 MAY 1963
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dawes Road Hub
20 Dawes Road
LONDON
SW6 7EN
- Phone:
- 02076031525
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window