THE CHINESE OVERSEAS CHRISTIAN MISSION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mission seeks to achieve its objectives mainily through the following activities: 1. Mission staff regularly are engaged in spreading the gospel through preaching and teaching in Chinese Churches and fellowships in the UK and Europe. 2. The Mission operates field visits, training thru Bible College and conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Belgium
- Canada
- China
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Italy
- Luxembourg
- Malaysia
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Romania
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 03 March 1965: Standard registration
- 03 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 03 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1135892 THE CHINESE OVERSEAS CHRISTIAN MISSION
- COCM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH JANUARY 1961.
Charitable objects
TO PREACH THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO PEOPLE OF CHINESE RACE RESIDENT IN GREAT BRITAIN AND OTHER EUROPEAN COUNTRIES AND TO ESTABLISH CHURCHES FOR CHINESE CHRISTIANS IN SUCH COUNTRIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window