Financial history THE GUILD OF OUR LADY OF RANSOM

Charity number: 232716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £399.20k £311.45k £424.14k £402.34k £449.02k
Total expenditure £148.95k £297.91k £378.82k £462.60k £445.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A