THE GUILD OF OUR LADY OF RANSOM

Charity Number: 232716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE GENERAL PURPOSE OF OUR GUILD IS THE FURTHERENCE AND EXTENSION OF THE CATHOLIC CHURCH THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES. OUR PRINCIPAL MEANS ARE THE APPRECIATION OF THE ENGLISH AND WELSH CATHOLIC HERITAGE THROUGH PILGRIMAGES AND PUBLICATIONS TOGETHER WITH THE CHARITABLE SUPPORT OF THE POOREST PARISHES IN OUR TWENTY-TWO DIOCESES, TOGETHER WITH THE ORDINARIATE OF OUR LADY OF WALSINGHAM.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £449,017
Total expenditure: £445,852

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1965: Standard registration
  • 10 April 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE CATHOLIC CHURCH EXTENSION SOCIETY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mgr Jonathan Armitage Chair 28 October 2020
None on record
Fr Patrick Eddy Lea van der Vorst Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Fr Paschal Ikechukwu Uche Trustee 15 June 2024
None on record
Eileen Patricia Cole Trustee 22 October 2022
None on record
AIDAN PATRICK CHRISTIE KC Trustee 02 July 2012
None on record
Dr PETER RYDEN MA MSC Trustee
None on record
GREGORY FRANCIS MARIUS THOMAS WHEATLEY Trustee
None on record
VANESSA DONEGAN MA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £399.20k £311.45k £424.14k £402.34k £449.02k
Total expenditure £148.95k £297.91k £378.82k £462.60k £445.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CLAUSE 16 OF 1933 CONSTITUTION
Charitable objects
THE INCOME TO BE AVAILABLE FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE GUILD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 March 1965 : Standard registration
  • 10 April 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARGARET'S PRESBYTERY
79A BARKING ROAD
CANNING TOWN
LONDON
E16 4HB
Phone:
020 7476 4129