THE P B DUMBELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity continues to support local charities in the West Midlands area, specifically around mental health, end of life support, young people and homelessness. The trustees do not make grants for educational purposes. Applications are reviewed twice yearly, in February and August.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dudley
- Herefordshire
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 13 June 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Barbara Jarvis MBE | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Aarvold | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.66k | £48.43k | £63.18k | £52.76k | £54.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.23k | £51.91k | £60.96k | £58.64k | £59.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 May 2022 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 May 2022 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 382 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 382 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 13TH JANUARY 1964 AND SUPPLEMENTAL SETTLEMENT DATED 21ST MAY 1969
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Hayton Grange
Lower Hayton
LUDLOW
Shropshire
SY8 2AQ
- Phone:
- 01584861371
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window