THE SCOFIELD CHIROPRACTIC CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Financial support for needy patients in the Sudbury Suffolk area. 2) Occasional financial help for students of chiropractic at university with fees as loans or grants after their second year. 3) As described in the original Trust Deed, executed in 1963 and subject to subsequent amendments as agreed by Trustees and approved by the Charity Commission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 April 1964: Standard registration
- THE ARTHUR SCOFIELD MEMORIAL TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER MAYHEW COBBALD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
OLIVER COBBALD | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW DOUGLAS COBBALD | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
HUGH DOUGLAS COBBALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.66k | £7.58k | £10.27k | £10.99k | £11.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.46k | £3.60k | £3.11k | £7.00k | £4.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 31 DECEMBER 1963 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 10 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG POOR PEOPLE BY MAKING AVAILABLE CHIROPRACTIC SERVICE TO THOSE UNABLE TO PAY FOR SUCH SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROOKMEAD
CHURCH ROAD
LITTLE BENTLEY
COLCHESTER
CO7 8SB
- Phone:
- 01206251145
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window