CHAPMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make grants primarily to culture and heritage; nature conservation; and activity, health and wellbeing (including research). We mainly support national charities, but also local charities if their beneficiaries or activities are located in North Wales, London or South East England (specifically Hertfordshire, Cambridgeshire, Essex, Kent, East Sussex, West Sussex, Surrey and Hampshire).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JOHN CHAPMAN | Chair | 26 February 1990 |
|
|
||||
Gregory William Chapman | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Edward Oswin Williams | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRYONY CHAPMAN | Trustee | 20 July 2007 |
|
|
||||
GUY JOHN ALEXANDER CHAPMAN | Trustee | 01 September 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £371.90k | £265.31k | £2.18m | £2.34m | £475.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £394.10k | £286.63k | £330.45k | £403.32k | £502.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.88m | £1.96m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £299.66k | £377.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £100 | £360 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.88m | £1.96m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £303.29k | £369.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £27.16k | £33.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £3.29k | £3.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £300.00k | £366.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £27.16k | £33.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 30 OCTOBER 1963
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RPGCC
40 Gracechurch Street
London
EC3V 0BT
- Phone:
- 0207 870 9050
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window