Financial history JOHN TOMLINSON CHARITY

Charity Number: 232795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.95k £10.92k £12.66k £49.71k £47.66k
Total expenditure £86.90k £6.37k £5.86k £17.99k £22.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A