JOHN TOMLINSON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objectives and Activities This remains the same. To provide low cost quality housing for the poor, infirm or aged persons of the community of Doncaster with the intention of providing social well being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Doncaster
Governance
- JOHN TOMLINSON'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- TOMLINSON'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM CHARLES BARNSDALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN TOWNEND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAYE WALTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUKI BURNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.95k | £10.92k | £12.66k | £49.71k | £47.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.90k | £6.37k | £5.86k | £17.99k | £22.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 21ST DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS WHO SHALL HAVE BEEN BORN IN THE DISTRICT COMPRISED WITHIN A RADIUS OF THREE MILES DRAWN IN EVERY DIRECTION FROM THE TOWN HALL OF DONCASTER OR WHO SHALL AT THE TIME OF ELECTION HAVE BEEN ACTUALLY RESIDENT WITHIN THE SAID DISTRICT FOR TEN YEARS AT LEAST IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING ELECTION.
Area of benefit
DONCASTER
Linked charities
- 02 April 1964 : Standard registration
- 14 March 1998 : Removed
- 14 March 1998 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
TAYLOR BRACEWELL
17-23 THORNE ROAD
DONCASTER
DN1 2RP
- Phone:
- 01302340400
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window