Linked charities WILLIAM BIRKETT (OF WENSLEY)
Charity Number: 232809
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 28/12/1836 AND SCHEME OF 23/11/1937 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOVEMBER 1993 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74A OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURCHASE OF BREAD FOR THE POOR OF TROUTBECK ATTENDING TROUTBECK CHURCH.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF TROUTBECK
Registration history
- 17 January 1964 : Standard registration
- 17 May 1994 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.