THE VILLAGE HALL (SHAPWICK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of Shapwick Village for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Shapwick and the neighbourhood with the object of improving the conditions of life for those within that community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
- SHAPWICK VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Rosalind Rayment | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Motum | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
BRIDGET DAWES | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
NERINA SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.23k | £73 | £3.65k | £34.15k | £31.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53k | £2.96k | £2.94k | £3.70k | £9.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 May 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 May 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN THE VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF SHAPWICK AND NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF FOR MEETINGS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
SHAPWICK AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Station Road
Shapwick
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA7 9NJ
- Phone:
- 01458 210185
- Email:
- shapwickvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window