Financial history HOMES OF REST FOR OLD PEOPLE ALSO KNOWN AS RADCLIFFE MANOR HOUSE

Charity number: 232858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £839.19k £913.20k £944.56k £860.90k £1.03m
Total expenditure £795.86k £904.42k £882.21k £994.04k £1.09m
Income from government contracts £129.20k £103.81k £180.64k £215.04k £211.10k
Income from government grants N/A £111.48k £92.35k £20.12k £4.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.91k £5.37k £5.37k £10.84k £7.53k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £81 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £826.93k £794.66k £845.35k £827.55k £1.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.34k £1.70k £1.41k £2.40k £4.55k
Income - Other £0 £111.48k £92.35k £20.12k £4.67k
Income - Legacies £0 £2.20k £4.15k £3.96k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £795.86k £904.42k £882.21k £994.04k £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.86k £9.87k £18.48k £38.61k £29.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £863.73k £955.43k £1.06m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0