Accounts and annual returns COUNCIL FOR WORLD MISSION
Charity Number: 232868
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 04 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 20 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 20 August 2007 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 22 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 05 October 2005 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window