Financial history COUNCIL FOR WORLD MISSION

Charity Number: 232868
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2004 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A