MAKERS OF PLAYING CARDS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. For the advancement, education, health and wellbeing of people under the age of 25. 2. For the relief of people in need who are members of the Worshipful Makers of Playing Cards Livery Company and their close dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 June 1964: Standard registration
- MAKERS OF PLAYING CARDS CHARITY (Working name)
- THE CUTLER TRUST (Working name)
- THE CUTLER TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Clare Whitlam | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Marisa Caroline Talbot JP | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Squire | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Corb | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Bole | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher George Bowhay | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Nichols | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Logan Green | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hussey | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAPT MICHAEL LEIGH DAVIS-MARKS OBE RN | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Prentice | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.63k | £88.52k | £103.92k | £116.91k | £142.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.28k | £94.53k | £89.16k | £111.31k | £118.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 OCT 1943 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 APR 1978 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18 JUL 2006 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2006 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OR EDUCATION OF ANY PERSON OF EITHER SEX WHO IS OR HAS BEEN AT ANY TIME IN THE MANUFACTURE OF PLAYING CARDS OR THEIR DEPENDANTS IN POOR AND NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AS DIRECTED BY THE MASTER WARDENS AND COURT OF ASSISTANTS OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF MAKERS OF PLAYING CARDS. IF AND IN SO FAR AS INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ABOVE THE SAME MAY BE APPLIED FOR ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING; 1) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED 2) IN ASSISTING PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OUTFITS OR BY PAYING FEES, TRAVELLING OR MAINTENANCE EXPENSES, OR BY OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OR ENABLE THEM, TO EARN THEIR LIVING; 3) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Ascot Way
BICESTER
OX26 1AG
- Phone:
- 01869 324776
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window