THE LIVERPOOL AND DISTRICT FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL

Charity number: 232907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants to support Ministers and students in recognised ministerial training. Grants for projects which enable outreach and mission, especially to children and young people. Grants to enable individuals, particularly young adults, to access practical training and discipleship which equips them for Christian service. Purchases Bibles for children and young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £23,050
Total expenditure: £25,371

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Knowsley
  • Liverpool City
  • Sefton
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MERSEYSIDE FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Geoffrey Felton Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
Major Allister Versfeld Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
Yvonne Campbell Trustee 15 April 2021
THE FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Rev PHILIP ANDREW JUMP Trustee
SKELMERSDALE ECUMENICAL CENTRE
Received: 103 days late
ONESIMUS COMMUNITY
Recently registered
NORTH WESTERN BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
INDUSTRIAL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN THE MERSEYSIDE REGION
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CHESHIRE
Received: On time
LADY HEWLEY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
RETIRED BAPTIST MINISTERS HOUSING ORGANISATION
Received: On time
THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Rev IAN DOUGLAS SMITH Trustee
MANOR CHILD CARE CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.20k £21.10k £20.74k £21.85k £23.05k
Total expenditure £33.58k £31.76k £29.54k £37.81k £25.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NW Baptist Association
The Resource Centre
Fleet Street
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN5 0DS
Phone:
01942 221595
Website:

No information available