Governing document THE CHARITY COMMISSION OFFICE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 232929

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 20TH DECEMBER 1983, 6TH JANUARY 1984, 17TH JANUARY 1989, 20TH NOVEMBER 1995, 10TH JANUARY 1997, 17 JULY 1998 AND 08 AUGUST 2008 as amended on 05 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONGST THOSE WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE CHARITY COMMISSION OR IN THE CASE OF DEATH OR INCAPACITY OF A PERSON SO QUALIFIED OF THOSE WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE THEMSELVES IN NEED
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.