Trustees KINGS COTTAGES TRUST
Charity number: 232955

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY ALAN GODFREY PRIBUL | Chair | 27 July 2001 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bush | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Noakes | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Tripp | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Engel | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Izzard | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Jan Richardson | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|||||
SUSAN JANE GILBEY | Trustee | 27 August 2002 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.