THE ARTHUR THOMSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities principal aim is, and continues to provide support and encouragement to students of medicine & dentistry in the form of scholarships, prizes, equipment and other facilities associated with their educational development who are currently studying MBChB and BDS at Birmingham Medical School and the School of Dentistry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 05 June 1964: Standard registration
- THE SIR ARTHUR THOMSON CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR IAN BOOTH W | Chair | 19 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Hutton | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR SANDY BUCHAN | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOLMES | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE WARRINGTON | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Sheppard | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adam Kendall | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.18k | £111.71k | £97.33k | £116.08k | £114.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.35k | £57.60k | £73.65k | £82.37k | £100.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH OCTOBER 1963
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SIR ARTHUR THOMSON CHARITABLE TRUST
THE CHAIRMAN'S OFFICE
CMDS
UNIVERSITY OF BIRMINGHAM
EDGBASTON
BIRMIING
- Phone:
- 01214158033
- Email:
- w.a.trevis-smith@bham.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window