CHARITY OF ANN HOWSDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RELIEF, INCLUDING PROVISION OF HOUSING, GOODS, SERVICES, FACILITIES OR GRANTS OF MONEY, TO PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF HINXTON WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF HINXTON BY PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 August 1966: Standard registration
- ANN HOWSDEN CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqui Gruby | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Benoit Genevier | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev LYDIA SMITH | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER MARY JOY GOODWIN | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MARTIN ELLIOTT | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Cunningham Brown | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHLOE LYNN BROWN | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert Pearson | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.85k | £25.03k | £23.62k | £25.20k | £22.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.76k | £23.82k | £19.30k | £55.62k | £31.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 August 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9TH NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24 JUN 2020 as amended on 21 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND B) TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE RESIDENTS. (2) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO: (A) MAKE GRANTS OF MONEY TO INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (B) PROVIDE HOUSING, PROVIDE OR PAY FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES; OR (C) MAKE GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (3) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS: (A) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR (B) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HINXTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Hunts Lane
Hinxton
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB10 1SG
- Phone:
- 01799531921
- Email:
- anc@nicholas-cliffe.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window