Accounts and annual returns BIDEFORD AREA CLUB FOR DISABLED LEARNERS

Charity number: 233114
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 05 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required