CYMDEITHAS CEREDIGION I'R DEILLION - CARDIGANSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the needs of the blind and partially sighted living within the county of Ceredigion. Working in conjunction with Ceredigion Social Services, and Wales Council for the Blind.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 06 August 1964: Standard registration
- CYMDEITHAS CEREDIGION I'R DEILLION (Working name)
- CARDIGANSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- CARDIGANSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND-CYMDEITHAS DEILLION CEREDIGION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Guest | Chair | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Carol-Jane Denham | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Marian Lewis | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sally Jane Corlett | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
SYDNEY GEORGE SMITH | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Amanda Dawn Francis | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Faaeza Jasdanwalla-Williams | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Bethan Evans | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
WILLIAM GWYN JONES | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Dafydd Ladd | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Gordon Harries | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Gillian Harries | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
ALISON HAMILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
CAROL EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
RHYS MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.30k | £2.13k | £2.47k | £4.65k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08k | £1.91k | £2.65k | £3.46k | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 1987, AS AMENDED 23 JUNE 2004, 27 APRIL 2005, 3 JUNE 2008 AND 24 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND VISUALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS AND SUCH ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION OF BLINDNESS.
Area of benefit
OLD ADMINISTATIVE AREA OF CARDIGAN DISTRICT COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Coed Y Bryn
Panteg
Aberaeron
Ceredigion
SA46 0DW
- Phone:
- 01545 570978
- Email:
- wgwynj@gmail.com
- Website:
-
wcb_ccd.org.uk/ceredigion
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window