COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is not active. The activities of this charity are now carried out through charity number 1089685 the Campaign to Protect Rural England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 May 1964: Standard registration
- 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
- C P R E (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AT GENERAL MEETING HELD ON 31ST MAY 1977 AS AMENDED ON 19TH FEBRUARY 1987, 12TH NOVEMBER 1992, 24TH JUNE 1998 AND 23RD OF JUNE 1999. 22ND NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION THE IMPROVEMENT, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENGLISH COUNTRYSIDE AND ITS TOWNS AND VILLAGES AND THE BETTER DEVELOPMENT OF THE RURAL ENVIRONMENT. (B) TO STIMULATE AND EDUCATE PUBLIC OPINION ON THE FOREGOING TOPICS. (C) TO ACT AS A CENTRE FOR ADVICE AND THE COLLECTION AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION UPON ANY MATTERS AFFECTING THE PLANNING, IMPROVEMENT AND PROTECTION OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND LANDSCAPE. (D) TO UNDERTAKE, SUPPORT AND CO-ORDINATE WORK IN FURTHERANCE OF ABOVE, INCLUDING EDUCATION, DESIGN, RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
CPRE
15-21 Provost Street
LONDON
N1 7NH
- Phone:
- 02079812800
- Email:
- info@cpre.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window