COXEDD AND PEARCE AND KIMBERS ALMHOUSES CHARITY

Charity number: 233204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of affordable housing for the elderly in need. This includes the interior and exterior maintenance of the almshouses.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £87,247
Total expenditure: £92,145

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COXED AND PEARCE AND KIMBERS ALMHOUSES CHARITY (Previous name)
  • COXEDDY PEARCE AND KIMBER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER ALEXANDER GREENHALGH Chair
JOHN KIMBER'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
David Charles Griffiths Trustee 27 March 2024
JOHN KIMBER'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ANTHONY HADWICK Trustee 04 September 2014
JOHN KIMBER'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
JENNIFER MARGARET EVANS Trustee 30 September 2013
JOHN KIMBER'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MRS JILL WILSON Trustee 13 September 2011
JOHN KIMBER'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHRISTOPHER SHOEMAKER CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Received: 41 days late
STUART DURRANT Trustee
JOHN KIMBER'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
SALLY MILES Trustee
JOHN KIMBER'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £59.80k £59.18k £61.46k £81.36k £87.25k
Total expenditure £58.53k £68.58k £54.65k £91.53k £92.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 04 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 04 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
47 Meyrick Drive
NEWBURY
Berkshire
RG14 6SY
Phone:
0163534036
Website:

No information available