Financial history BUTLER'S CHARITY

Charity number: 233205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.66k £7.14k £11.02k £10.95k £10.28k
Total expenditure £14.67k £11.59k £11.46k £4.39k £6.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A