DOLE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide residence of almspeople in the almshouses belonging to the charity. Surplus income may also be used for the benefit of elderly persons who are in conditions of need and resident in the area of benefit. Income obtained from the letting of land belonging to the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 June 1964: Standard registration
- 12 November 2013: Funds received from 266864 WALPOLE ST ANDREW COMMUNITY CHEST TRUST/ STEAM ENG...
- THE WALPOLE ST ANDREW DOLE CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Barbara Burton | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Galloway | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Roberson | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Hunter | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW STEVEN BLISS | Trustee | 15 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ROGER FREDERICK HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WILLIAM ROBERT BROOKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.08k | £12.98k | £14.58k | £13.30k | £13.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.38k | £6.96k | £20.82k | £10.77k | £19.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 January 2022 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 28 OCTOBER 1958 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 1 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR THE POOR AND SUBJECT TO AN ANNUAL PAYMENT IN RESPECT OF THE EXTRAORDINARY REPAIR FUND, THE INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITY, OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WALPOLE ST. ANDREW
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Abbeyfields
Abbey Road
Great Massingham
Norfolk
PE32 2JE
- Phone:
- 07368 861696
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window