CHARITY OF JOHN BEND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help to elderly of the parish, those whose income is under a certain amount per month
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 August 1964: Standard registration
- JOHN BENDS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Fryett | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
David Wheatley | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
David Scrimshaw | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
COLIN DESBOROUGH | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
ANGELA WELDON | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
MARTIN HOLMES | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
TONY FOWLER | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
PETER ALLEN | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter NEWTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MR S BLISS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
CHARLES ALLEN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
PHILIP RALPH WADSLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.45k | £8.31k | £12.00k | £9.29k | £9.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.09k | £9.82k | £15.19k | £7.98k | £7.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 1/7/1593 (PR.31 P.276) SCHEME DATED 28/3/1962
Charitable objects
TOWARDS THE MAKING OF AS STOCK TO SET THE POOR PEOPLE ON WORK, OR TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONG SUCH POOR PEOPLE INHABITING WITHIN MURROW, GUYHERN THOLOMERS AND ST. MARY'S IN WISBECH
Area of benefit
WISBECH ST. MARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LIMES
HAROLDS BANK
GOREFIELD
WISBECH
PE13 4PU
- Phone:
- 07962319136
- Email:
- lbrownlow173@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window