Financial history SEBASTIAN RATHBONE FUND

Charity Number: 233239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £20.77k £19.74k £22.80k £24.45k £29.12k
Total expenditure £29.54k £37.28k £27.47k £21.27k £28.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A