WORLD DAY OF PRAYER NATIONAL COMMITTEE FOR ENGLAND, WALES AND NORTHERN IRELAND

Charity number: 233242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main objective is to unite Christians in prayer by (a) holding services on 1st Friday in March in each year;(b) fostering local interdenominational prayer groups and other activities;(c) distribution of Christian literature;(d) support women throughout the world with informed prayer and prayerful action;(e) assisting projects, financially or otherwise, run by Christian charities worldwide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £336,673
Total expenditure: £362,447

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 January 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • W W D P (Working name)
  • WWDP (Working name)
  • NATIONAL COMMITTEE OF THE WOMEN'S WORLD DAY OF PRAYER FOR ENGLAND AND WALES AND NORTHERN IRELAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaine Barnett Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Elizabeth Louise Bowes Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Rev CAROLE BOURNE Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £480.35k £435.41k £308.66k £369.74k £336.67k
Total expenditure £379.70k £417.58k £310.03k £427.76k £362.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 November 2023 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 November 2023 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WORLD DAY OF PRAYER
COMMERCIAL ROAD
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN1 2RR
Phone:
01892541411