CHARITY FUND 1961 STATIONERS AND NEWSPAPER MAKERS COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity may apply its income to or for any charitable institution or purpose. The charity meets its objectives by applying its income to trade benevolent societies and other institutions associated with the Worshipful Company of Stationers and Newspaper Makers. Civic and other appeals, including the Lord Mayor's appeal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

28 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- STATIONERS' FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE STATIONERS' COMMUNITY FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Nicholas Brealey | Chair | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
David Peter Bateman | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Rodney Smith | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert William Knowles | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bettine Pellant | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Linda Sally Drew | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Scrimgeour | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Ruth Allinson DL | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Louise Jones | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jani Tapio Levanen | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ilan Drori CBE | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Douglas Wills | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Joseph Heanue | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN GEOFFREY HARVEY LEGGETT | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN TULLO | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS MOCKETT | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Edward Gadsby | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Garrett Mash | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Moira Ruth Sleight | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN JAMES | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILSON | Trustee | 23 August 2013 |
|
|||||
MARTIN W A RANDALL | Trustee | 07 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUE PANDIT | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT M FLATHER | Trustee | 23 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR J FENWICK | Trustee | 23 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS STEIDL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN ESMONDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.89k | £25.44k | £29.85k | £21.28k | £23.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.50k | £33.44k | £55.38k | £46.13k | £18.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ACT OF PARLIAMENT 1961 9 AND 10 ELIZABETH 2 CHAPTER XXX AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FUND TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS, PURPOSE OR PURPOSES (INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR THE POOR OF THE COMPANY) AND IN SUCH SHARES BETWEEN THEM IF MORE THAN ONE, AS THE COURT OF ASSISTANTS SHALL FROM TIME AT ITS DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worshipful Company of Stationers &
Newspaper Mak
Stationers Hall
Stationers Hall Court
Ave Maria Lane
EC4M 7DD
- Phone:
- 020 7248 2934
- Email:
- foundation@stationers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window