THE OWEN OWEN TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Owen Owen Trust gives grants for the relief of persons in need who were formerly employed by any company in the Owen Owen group of companies or are the spouses or dependents of persons who were so employed. This also includes concession staff and consultant staff formerly working within the Owen Owen group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 May 1964: Standard registration
- OWEN OWEN NO 1 TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHRYN MARY EGGLETON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Gibbon | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Lochiel-Owen | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Robert Stanley Warren | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEONARD FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN GEOFFREY TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN STEWARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN STEPHEN BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.71k | £87.72k | £86.93k | £87.07k | £83.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £378.14k | £336.29k | £324.53k | £291.71k | £280.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 March 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 March 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/01/1900 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 11/02/1964, DEED OF PARTITION DATED 10/10/2000, ORDER DATED 21/07/2003, SCHEME OF 22/05/2008 AND RESOLUTION UNDER S75A OF CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY CHARITIES ACT 2006 AND APPROVED 06/03/2009.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED FORMERLY EMPLOYED BY THE OWEN OWEN GROUP AND THEIR SPOUSES AND DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3.27 Merchants Court
2-12 Lord Street
Liverpool
Merseyside
L2 1TS
- Phone:
- 075104207081
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window