Trustees LOWESTOFT AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY
Charity number: 233331

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE GUYTON | Chair |
|
||||||
Nathan Jon Anthony McWade | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Roll | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Craig | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toni Jackson | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Giselle Czajka | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID BEN HOLLINGWORTH | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.