Accounts and annual returns CONGREGATION OF PRIESTS OF THE SACRED HEART OF JESUS OF BETHARRAM

Charity number: 233335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window