THE LONDON DISTRICT AND SOUTH EASTERN PROVINCIAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES (INCORPORATED)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acts as a grant making body and resource for information and advice to Unitarian and Free Christian congregations throughout London and the South East. Sponsors SimpleGifts:Unitarian Centre for Social Action, its related community centre and training programmes in London and across the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 August 1967: Standard registration
- L D P A (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Ellen Sinnamon | Chair | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Victor Frederick Anderson | Trustee | 29 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Teresa O'Sullivan | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Feargus McCabe O'Connor | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julio Torres | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Ramsay | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.73k | £89.69k | £60.59k | £64.10k | £86.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.94k | £281.29k | £126.08k | £132.33k | £156.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/02/1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25/11/1970 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE SPREAD OF THE RELIGIOUS IDEAS USUALLY DESCRIBED AS UNITARIAN OR FREE CHRISTIAN BY: (A) PROMOTING FELLOWSHIP AMONG MEMBER CONGREGATIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH ORGANISING LECTURES, WORSHIP SERVICES, CONFERENCES AND MEETINGS; (B) ASSISTING MEMBER CONGREGATIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH PROVIDING INFORMATION AND MAKING GRANTS; (C) PROMOTING THE FORMATION OF NEW CONGREGATIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT; (D) RAISING AWARENESS OF UNITARIAN OR FREE CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS IDEAS TO THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND INFORMATION. (2) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE, GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, LIVING IN ENGLAND BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES THAT ADVANCE THE STUDY OR SPREAD OF THE RELIGIOUS IDEAS USUALLY DESCRIBED AS UNITARIAN OR FREE CHRISTIAN. (3) DOING ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS IS INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF ANY OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 02 August 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
ESSEX HALL
1-6 ESSEX STREET
LONDON
WC2R 3HY
- Phone:
- 07775 253920
- Email:
- alluredm@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window