Financial history RICHARD GAITSKILL AND SIR THOMAS PRESTON

Charity number: 233409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.39k £3.55k £3.61k £3.59k £3.79k
Total expenditure £9.61k £6.71k £7.78k £8.14k £7.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A